FL H0943 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the use of specified factors in calculating alimony pendente lite; providing presumptions concerning alimony awards depending on the duration of marriages; providing for imputation of income in certain circumstances; declaring public policy concerning a child's interests regarding time sharing in custody and support proceedings; prohibiting a court from changing the duration of an alimony award; providing for motions to advance the trial of certain actions if a specified period has passed since the initial service on the respondent, etc.
Title
Family Law
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Sen. Colleen Burton [R] | Rep. Ritch Workman [R] |
Rep. Fredrick Costello [R] | Rep. Eric Eisnaugle [R] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#314 (Y: 93 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 93 NAYS 22 |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (533239) |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-03 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-03 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-02 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3 |
2015-03-31 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/02/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-23 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-17 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2015-03-13 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/17/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1248 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 2579 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 1827 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |