FL H0937 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to offer perinatal mental health care information through Family Health Line toll-free hotline accessible to general public; revises components included in postpartum evaluation & followup care provided by birth centers to include mental health screening & information on postpartum depression; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Perinatal Mental Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#699 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-98
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 138
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-03-05SenateReceived
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 750
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-21HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-02-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-19HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseCS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-26HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-23HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-12-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S138 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 937

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
383014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951053Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback