FL H0937 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-246

Summary

Revises definitions relating to West Palm Beach Firefighters Pension Fund; revises terms of board members; provides that authorized fiduciary may sign drafts for fund disbursements; provides additional requirements for board relating to certain holdings; deletes certain requirements relating to service pension for normal retirement, including optional transition benefits for certain employees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of West Palm Beach, Palm Beach County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-246
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01285
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00945; Read 3rd time -SJ 00945; Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00945
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00868; Referred to Rules -SJ 00868
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00905; Read 3rd time -HJ 00905; Passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 -HJ 00905
2010-04-07 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00647; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00647
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-11 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00269
2010-03-10 Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00269
2010-03-08 On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC), 03/10/10, 3:00 pm, 116-K
2010-03-03 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00208; Now in Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00208
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00083; On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-01 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-02-18 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-02-05 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback