FL H0931 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts & enters state into interstate Compact for Balanced Budget; exempts compact from Article V Constitutional Convention Act; provides for proposal by compact's member states of amendment to U.S. Constitution requiring Federal Government to maintain balanced budget with certain exceptions; provides for member states to apply to Congress for convention under Article V of U.S. Constitution to propose balanced budget amendment; provides for appointment, terms, duties, & authority of convention delegates; requires oath by delegates; specifies rules governing procedures at convention; establishes Compact Commission & specifies commission's membership & duties; provides for appointment of Compact Administrator & specifies administrator's duties.
Title
Interstate Compacts
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Hill [R] | Rep. Neil Combee [R] | Rep. Ross Spano [R] | Rep. Jennifer Sullivan [R] |
Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] | Rep. John Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2015-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-17 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2015-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/17/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1242 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/931 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0931/BillText/Filed/PDF |