FL H0929 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires ignition interlock provider to discount monthly leasing fee for ignition interlock device by certain percentage for certain persons; exempts such person from paying costs of installation of device; authorizes court to withhold adjudication of guilt for certain DUI offenses; requires court to order adjudication of guilt if certain requirements are not met; authorizes person to petition court for withhold of adjudication 5 years after his or her conviction.
Title
Driving Under the Influence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S612 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 1937 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 656 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/929 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/929/BillText/Filed/PDF |