FL H0927 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes mobile home owner's association to assess capital contribution fee of specified amounts under certain circumstances; requires certain closing documents of a cooperative unit to include as a line item the capital contribution assessment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lake County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#49 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#494 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21 Chapter No. 2020-192
2020-09-18 Approved by Governor
2020-09-04 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-03-02SenateReceived
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Rules
2020-02-26SenateIn Messages
2020-02-26HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-13HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-05HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-30HouseNow in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2020-01-29HouseCS by Local Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-29HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-29HouseCS by Local Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Administration Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-12HouseReferred to Local Administration Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-12-12HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback