FL H0925 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Hormonal Long-acting Reversible Contraception Program within DOH; requires department to contract with family planning providers to implement program & provide hormonal long-acting reversible contraception services throughout state; requires annual appropriation to operate program; requires department to submit annual report to Governor & Legislature by specified date & publish such report on its website.
Title
Hormonal Long-acting Reversible Contraception Program
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] | Rep. Yvonne Hayes Hinson [D] | Rep. Felicia Simone Robinson [D] | Rep. Marie Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1154 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/925 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/925/BillText/Filed/PDF |