FL H0925 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates North River Ranch Improvement Stewardship District; provides charter; requires referendum for ad valorem taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manatee County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#48 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#476 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09 Approved by Governor
2020-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-02-26SenateReceived
2020-02-24SenateReferred to Rules
2020-02-20SenateIn Messages
2020-02-20HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-07HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2020-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-06HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-06HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/06/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-27HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-27HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 01/27/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-20HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2020-01-16HouseCS by Local Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-16HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-16HouseCS by Local Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Local Administration Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-12-12HouseReferred to Local Administration Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-12-12HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback