FL H0919 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits municipalities, counties, special districts, or other political subdivisions from restricting or prohibiting types or fuel sources of energy production used, delivered, converted, or supplied by certain entities to customers; voids existing specified documents & policies that are preempted by this act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preemption Over Restriction of Utility Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#260 (Y: 81 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Approved by Governor
2021-06-18 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 27 NAYS 13
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1128
2021-04-22SenateReceived
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-22SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2021-04-22SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-22HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-22SenateIn Messages
2021-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 81, NAYS 34
2021-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-21HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 875969 Failed
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 528267 Failed
2021-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 048391 withdrawn
2021-04-21HouseAmendment 033655 withdrawn
2021-04-19HouseAmendment 048391 filed
2021-04-19HouseAmendment 033655 filed
2021-04-19HouseAmendment 875969 filed
2021-04-19HouseAmendment 528267 filed
2021-04-18HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/21/2021)
2021-04-16HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-16HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-15House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-15HouseCS Filed
2021-04-15HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-14HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-14HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-23HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-23HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseFavorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-19HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-16HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseOriginal reference removed: Ways & Means Committee
2021-03-12House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-12HouseCS Filed
2021-03-12HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-12HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-11HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-22HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1128 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 919

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
366032Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Amendment/534993/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Amendment/528267/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Amendment/033655/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Amendment/048391/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Amendment/875969/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Analyses/h0919.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Analyses/h0919a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Analyses/h0919b.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Analyses/h0919c.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Analyses/h0919d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Analyses/h0919e.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Analyses/h0919z.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Vote/HouseVote_h00919c2260.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/919/Vote/SenateVote_h00919c2015.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58236&IsPCB=0&BillId=71931
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59092&IsPCB=0&BillId=71931
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60352&IsPCB=0&BillId=71931

Bill Comments 750

feedback