FL H0919 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides criteria to be used in determining value of tax exemptions for charitable use of certain hospitals; provides application requirements for tax exemptions on certain properties.
Title
Property Tax Exemptions Used by Hospitals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#570 (Y: 93 N: 15 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-03-06 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 93 NAYS 15 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-02-13 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-11 | House | CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/11/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-12-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7097 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-10