FL H0919 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes municipalities to levy special assessments to fund costs of providing law enforcement services; requires that municipalities meet certain criteria to levy & collect special assessment; provides methodology for apportionment of special assessment & reduction of ad valorem millage; requires property appraiser to list special assessments on notices of property taxes; provides for termination of municipality's authority to levy special assessment; authorizes DOR to adopt certain rules & forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Assessment for Law Enforcement Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-04-03HouseNow in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-04-03HouseCS referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-04-03HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee
2015-04-02HouseCS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time
2015-04-02HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-31HouseCS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2015-03-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 03/31/15, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2015-03-03HouseReferred to Finance and Tax Committee; Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0780 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
166212Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback