FL H0919 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2013-153)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2013-153)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain children's specialty-licensed hospitals to provide obstetrical services under certain circumstances.
Title
Hospital Licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2013-153) |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 03/28/13, 8:00 am, 306 HOB --Temporarily deferred |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1159 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-153
S1264 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2013-153)
S1264 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2013-153)