FL H0915 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines terms relating to disposition of human remains; revises procedures for reporting & disposition of unclaimed remains; prohibits certain uses or dispositions of remains of deceased persons whose identities are not known; requires that local governmental contracts for final disposition of unclaimed remains comply with certain federal regulations; revises procedures for anatomical board's retention of human remains before their use; provides for claims by, & release of human remains to, legally authorized persons after payment of certain expenses, etc.
Title
Disposition of Human Remains
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 79 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 79 | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1324 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
406 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
406 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/915 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0915/BillText/Filed/HTML |