FL H0903 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain employers to implement outdoor heat exposure safety program approved by specified agencies; specifies requirements for program; provides responsibilities for certain employers & employees; provides exceptions; requires specified annual training on heat illness & provides requirements for such training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Heat Illness Prevention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseDied in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-02-28HouseNow in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
2023-02-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S706 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
448112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback