FL H0903 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act "Economic Redemption and Restoration of Constitutional Rights Act"; authorizes person suffering from legal disability due to criminal conviction to apply for relief; provides exceptions.
Title
Restoration of Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Cord Byrd [R] | Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D] | Rep. Chuck Clemons [R] | Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] | Rep. Rene Plasencia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1654 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 2925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/903 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/903/BillText/Filed/PDF |