FL H0889 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Florida Family Leave Act"; requires employer to allow certain employees to take paid family leave to bond with minor child upon child's birth, adoption, or foster care placement; provides requirements, limitations, & duties; provides for civil action & penalties & criminal penalty; prohibits specified employment practices on basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or medical condition related to pregnancy or childbirth; provides for leave, maintenance of health coverage, reasonable accommodation & transfer, & return rights for employee who is disabled from pregnancy, childbirth, or medical condition related to pregnancy or childbirth.
Title
Employment Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-12-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1194 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
444 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
444 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/889 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/889/BillText/Filed/PDF |