FL H0879 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes surviving spouses of certain permanently disabled veterans to carry over certain discount on ad valorem taxes on homestead property under specified conditions; authorizes discount to be transferred to another permanent residence under specified conditions; provides procedure by which applicant may file application after specified date & request discount; authorizes DOR to adopt emergency rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surviving Spouse Ad Valorem Tax Reduction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#522 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-05SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 460
2020-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenateReceived
2020-03-04SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1074
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenateWithdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2020-03-04SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2020-03-04SenateIn Messages
2020-03-04HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-20HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2020-02-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-11HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-11HouseFavorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 02/11/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-15HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2020-01-15HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-12-12HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-12-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H877 (Related) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
S1074 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 879
H881 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
S1076 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HJR 877

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
196082Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback