FL H0871 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Declares legislative priorities relating to importation & uncontrolled breeding of dogs & cats; requires certain public & private animal shelters, humane organizations, & animal control agencies to prepare & maintain specified records; limits fees for copies of such records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Shelters and Animal Control Agencies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-19HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
2013-02-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0997 (Similar To) 2013-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
S0674 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Chapter No. 2013-32
H0839 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
S0872 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82315Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback