FL H0861 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-189, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 859 (Ch. 2015-188)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands district boundaries; requires referendum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Greater Naples Fire Rescue District, Collier County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#326 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-189, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 859 (Ch. 2015-188)
2015-06-10 Approved by Governor
2015-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-29SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 04/29/15
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 1
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
2015-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-10HouseCS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-10HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-09HouseCS by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-04-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-25HouseNow in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-03-25HouseFavorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
2015-03-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 03/25/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2015-03-10HouseNow in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-03-10HouseFavorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-02-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0859 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-188, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 861 (Ch. 2015-189)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback