FL H0859 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-245

Summary

Revises definition of term "salary"; authorizes other fiduciary designees to sign fund drafts; clarifies exception relating to adoption of experience tables & interest rates; provides for adjustment of benefits when changing joint annuitants or beneficiaries; removes requirement for spouse's consent to waive joint & survivor benefit; provides for quarterly adjustment of share accounts; provides exception to exclusion for disabled members, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

West Palm Beach Police Pension Fund/Palm Beach Co.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-245
2010-05-26 Approved by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01285
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00944; Read 3rd time -SJ 00944; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00944
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00868; Referred to Rules -SJ 00868
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00905; Read 3rd time -HJ 00905; CS passed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 -HJ 00905
2010-04-07 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00647; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00647
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-15 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00279
2010-03-12 CS read 1st time on 03/12/10 -HJ 00271; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-10 CS by Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00273
2010-03-08 On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC), 03/10/10, 3:00 pm, 116-K
2010-03-03 Favorable by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00208; Now in Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00208
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00078; On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-01 On Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-02-10 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-02-02 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback