FL H0853 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides contractual relationships held by business entities are deemed held by public officers or employees in certain situations; provides ethics training requirements; prohibits persons from voting or participating in official capacity on specified matters; requires certain persons to file disclosure; requires annual report by DFS.
Title
Local Government Ethics Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#164 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Public Integrity & Elections Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-03-23 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-04 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported out of Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-02 | House | Added to Public Integrity & Elections Committee agenda |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |