FL H0851 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires consumer reporting agency to provide certain creditor information to consumer upon written request; provides liability; provides civil penalties; authorizes award of costs & attorney fees to prevailing plaintiff in certain actions.
Title
Consumer Reporting Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1126 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/851 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0851/BillText/Filed/PDF |