FL H0851 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that person who commits multiple acts of animal cruelty against one animal or acts of animal cruelty against multiple animals may be charged with separate offense for each such act of animal cruelty; specifies that person who owns or has custody or control of any animal & fails to act commits aggravated animal cruelty if certain injuries or death result; prohibits specific acts relating to dyeing or artificially coloring certain animals; prohibit selling, offering for sale, or giving away as merchandising premiums specified fowl or rabbits to be used as pets, toys, or retail premiums; provides exceptions; including illegal animal fighting or baiting as offense within definition of "racketeering activity" for purposes of Florida RICO Act.
Title
Animal Cruelty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#128 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#128 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chapter No. 2013-245 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 504 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Agriculture; Criminal Justice |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Criminal Justice |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-17 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (624529) |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/13, 8:30 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/28/13, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-15 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2013-03-13 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/13, 10:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0504 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2013-245)
S0650 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2013-245)
S0650 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 851 (Ch. 2013-245)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
828 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 1615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |