FL H0849 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education & Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education & Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes district school boards to determine licensed professionals that may attest to sickness or injury for certain exemption to attendance policy.
Title
School Absence Due to Sickness or Injury
Sponsors
House Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee | Rep. Susan Valdes [D] | Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. Dianne Hart [D] |
Rep. Daisy Morales [D] | Rep. Anika Omphroy [D] | Rep. Marie Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-24 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-23 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1158 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education