FL H0849 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates Tera Ross Memorial Interchange in Lake County; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Government Accountability Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-16HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-16HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-09HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-09HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-12-08HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
H171 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback