FL H0841 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DEP to include protocols for use of long-term natural attenuation where site conditions warrant; requires specified interactive effects of contaminants to be considered as cleanup criteria; revises how cleanup target levels are applied where surface waters are exposed to contaminated groundwater; authorizes use of relevant data & information when assessing cleanup target levels; provides that institutional controls are not required under certain circumstances if using alternative cleanup target levels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contaminated Sites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar
2015-04-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15
2015-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-27HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-03-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-26HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2015-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2015-03-24HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2015-03-24HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 10:00 am, Reed Hall
2015-03-12HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-11HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-10HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2015-02-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1302 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2870595Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37630701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback