FL H0839 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each district school board to adopt rules for display of official state motto in specified places.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Display of the State Motto

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#634 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-28SenateReceived
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-28SenateIn Messages
2018-02-21HousePassed; YEAS 97 NAYS 10 643
2018-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-07HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
2018-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/07/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-23HouseNow in Education Committee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-11-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1158 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100344Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback