FL H0837 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes construction relating to Citizens Property Insurance Corporation coverage rates; delays future repeal of the Hurricane Loss Mitigation Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hurricane Loss Mitigation Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-16HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-12-16HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-12-16HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-16HouseReferred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-12-16HouseReferred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2021-12-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S578 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215559Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback