FL H0833 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Minor Traffic Safety Act; prohibits use of handheld cellular telephones & other electronic communications devices by drivers under 18 years of age & persons driving school buses; provides for voluntary checkoff on driver's license applications to permit contributions to AAA Foundation for Traffic Safety; requires DHSMV to issue distinctive placard when issuing or reissuing driver's license to person under certain age; requires such person to display placard at all times while operating motor vehicle, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 72
2011-03-03 Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 72
2011-02-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1840 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3160075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32216Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback