FL H0831 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates State Board of Community Colleges; revises function & mission of Florida K-20 education system; revises provisions relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary Education
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-11-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S540 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H423 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 4
S4 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-4
S1434 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S2508 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died, not introduced
H423 (Similar To) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 4
S4 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-4
S1434 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S2508 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died, not introduced
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1000 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 6001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 493 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 084 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 0961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 262 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 264 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 273 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 855 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 86 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/831 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/831/BillText/Filed/PDF |