FL H0831 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires nursing home to provide copy of resident's paper & electronic records upon receipt of written request that meets certain federal requirements; requires facility to furnish resident's records within certain timeframe; authorizes certain persons to make request for deceased resident's records; requires that request for deceased resident's records be in writing & meet certain federal requirements; specifies certain documentation that must accompany request for deceased resident's records; authorizes facility to refuse to furnish records; provides that facility is not criminally or civilly liable for furnishing resident's records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing Home Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
2014-02-27HouseWithdrawn from Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2014-02-14HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2014-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1042 (Similar To) 2014-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)
S0670 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-83
H0569 (Similar To) 2014-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 670 (Ch. 2014-83)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429294Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback