FL H0831 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces number of days within which dispenser must report to DOH that controlled substance has been dispensed; removes prohibition against certain funding by prescription drug manufacturers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substance Prescription

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied on Calendar
2013-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-04-10HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2013-04-10HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-04-09HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 2
2013-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/13, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2013-04-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred
2013-03-21HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2013-03-21HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2013-03-21HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2013-03-20HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-03-19HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2013-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 9:00 am, 306 HOB
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-28HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2013-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1192 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4099201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458326Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
461013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650197Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466028Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback