FL H0831 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-244

Summary

Provides that certain single-family docks located in Nassau River-St. Johns River Marshes Aquatic Preserve must meet specified criteria; authorizes DEP to take action against owners of docks that do not meet such criteria after specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nassau County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-244
2010-05-28 Allowed to become Law without Governor's Signature 2010-244
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01285
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00943; Placed on Local Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00944; Read 3rd time -SJ 00944; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00944
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00868; Referred to Rules -SJ 00868
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00912; Read 3rd time -HJ 00912; CS passed; YEAS 92 NAYS 6 -HJ 00912
2010-04-09 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00655
2010-04-08 CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -HJ 00643; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-04-07 CS/CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 00648
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-29 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00425
2010-03-26 CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00403; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-25 CS/CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00408
2010-03-23 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 03/25/10, 2:45 pm, Reed Hall
2010-03-16 Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC) -HJ 00300
2010-03-15 CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 11 NAYS 2 -HJ 00280; CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00277; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-11 PCS on Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/15/10, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00076
2010-02-10 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-01-28 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback