FL H0827 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for conversion of limited agricultural associations to corporations not for profit; specifies fee for filing limited agricultural association's certificate of conversion to domestic corporation; provides procedures for conversion of limited agricultural association to domestic corporation not for profit; requires filing of certificate of conversion & articles of incorporation with DOS; provides for effective date of conversion; provides that conversion does not affect any obligation or liability of association; provides that all rights, property, & obligations of association are vested in corporation; specifies that association is not required to wind up its affairs or pay its liabilities & distribute its assets; provides for association's approval before certificate of conversion is filed; authorizes association to provide plan or other record of conversion.
Title
Limited Agricultural Associations
Sponsors
House Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | Rep. Elizabeth Porter [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] | Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#37 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#888 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#888 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1714 | |
2012-03-09 | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 1191 | |
2012-03-09 | Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Agriculture; Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 1191 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Agriculture; Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; Budget -SJ 821 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 821 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 785 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 785 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 731 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 549 | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 549 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-02-01 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 322 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 322 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 12:30 pm, 306 HOB | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 225 | |
2012-01-17 | Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 247 | |
2012-01-13 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-11 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 227 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 81 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB | |
2011-12-12 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 81 | |
2011-11-30 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
604 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 0122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
617 | 1809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |