FL H0823 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that specified entities that take receivership of lost or stray dogs or cats shall adopt written policies & procedures to ensure that every reasonable effort is made to quickly & reliably return animals to their owners; provides requirements for such policies & procedures; requires that specified records be available to public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lost or Stray Dogs or Cats

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-11-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1576 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-87
H473 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
823151Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback