FL H0819 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the future removal of dental services as a minimum benefit of managed care plans; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability to provide a report to the Governor and Legislature; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to implement a statewide Medicaid prepaid dental health program upon the occurrence of certain conditions; specifying requirements for the program and the selection of providers, etc.
Title
Sunset Review of Medicaid Dental Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#609 (Y: 100 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#609 (Y: 100 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Chapter No. 2016-109 | |
2016-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 2 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for SB 994 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 100 NAYS 15 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (735629) |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/09/16, 11:30 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-21 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Favorable by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 1:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-12-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0994 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 819 (Ch. 2016-109)