FL H0817 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides requirements for operating as a transportation network company or operating as a transportation network company driver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Network Companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#250 (Y: 65 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#249 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar
2015-04-28HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2015-04-27HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2015-04-24HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseAmendment(s) adopted (214973)
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-03-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-30HouseCS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-03-30HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-26HouseCS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4
2015-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2015-03-16HouseNow in Economic Affairs Committee
2015-03-13HouseCS by Transportation and Ports Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-10HouseCS by Transportation and Ports Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
2015-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Ports Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Transportation and Ports Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
2015-02-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1326 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316680Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627733Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/817
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/775181/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/901903/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/910455/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/654767/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/342497/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/595609/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/011313/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/051681/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/214973/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/734069/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/560333/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Amendment/836735/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Vote/HouseVote_h0817c2249.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0817/Vote/HouseVote_h0817c2250.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback