FL H0815 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defines instant bingo dispensers; authorizes dispensing of instant bingo tickets by instant bingo ticket dispensers.
Title
Bingo
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC) | |
2010-03-30 | Now in Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00425 | |
2010-03-29 | CS read 1st time on 03/29/10 -HJ 00414; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-25 | CS by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 8 NAYS 6 -HJ 00418 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/25/10, 2:45 pm, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00074 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council | |
2010-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0364 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar