FL H0809 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Grants sales & use tax credit for restaurants purchasing & installing baby changing tables on their premises; specifies limitations on credit; authorizes excess amounts of credit to be taken on future submitted tax returns for specified timeframe.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Credit for Baby Changing Tables in Restaurants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Ways and Means Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S236 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback