FL H0799 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urges Congress to direct U.S. EPA to issue memorandum of agreement by July 1, 2019, so Florida can complete assumption of section 404 dredge & fill permitting program under federal Clean Water Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dredge and Fill Permitting Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-17SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS adopted
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-08HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 1
2019-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/08/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-28HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback