FL H0799 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DCF to adopt or amend licensing rules for child-placing agencies to include specific requirements to prevent separation of siblings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child-Placing Agencies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-11-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S998 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback