FL H0795 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires school districts to provide instruction in cardiopulmonary resuscitation & use of automated external defibrillator; provides student & instruction requirements; provides exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation in Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-11-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S996 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
H7055 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 2018-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003453Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003457Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback