FL H0787 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-59
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Designates act "Child Abduction Prevention Act"; authorizes additional persons to move to have certain restrictions placed in parenting plans upon showing of risk that one party may violate court's parenting plan by removing child from this state or country or by concealing child's whereabouts; authorizes courts to impose certain restrictions in parenting plans upon specified finding, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Abduction Prevention [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0044 - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0844 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-59
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -SJ 00736; CS passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 0 -SJ 00737
2010-04-21 In Messages; Received -SJ 00717; Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00717; Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00699; Substituted for CS/SB 1862 -SJ 00699; Read 2nd time -SJ 00699
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -HJ 00802; CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00802
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00782
2010-04-13 Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00676; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00676
2010-04-09 CS/CS by Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00655; CS read 1st time on 04/09/10 -HJ 00652; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00655; On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/13/10, 9:15 am, 404-H
2010-04-07 On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 04/09/10, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-25 Now in Policy Council -HJ 00406
2010-03-24 CS read 1st time on 03/24/10 -HJ 00395; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-22 CS by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00397
2010-03-18 On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 03/22/10, 3:15 pm, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00072
2010-02-05 Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2010-01-22 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1862 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00699; Substituted CS/CS/HB 787 -SJ 00699; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 787 (Ch. 2010-59) -SJ 00699

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
006145Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0787&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb078700.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb078701c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb078702c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB07870421100844.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB07870422100044.html

Bill Comments

feedback