FL H0783 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies offenses that allow state attorney to file information for specified juvenile offenders; prohibits filing informations for juveniles with certain conditions; specifies effects of direct file; prohibits certain juvenile offenders from being transferred to adult court; requires DJJ to collect specified data & make report; specifies minimum age for indictment of juvenile for certain offenses; prohibits certain juvenile offenders from being transferred to adult court; deletes provisions relating to sentencing of juveniles as adults for certain offenses; revises provisions relating to transfer of other pending felony charges when child has been indicted; revises factors to be considered in determining whether to impose juvenile or adult sanctions for violations of law by juvenile; requires court to consider specified reports in hearing on such sentencing; revises provisions relating to sentencing alternatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charging Youths as Adults in Criminal Proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-23HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-20HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-16HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2015-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/16/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-02-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1082 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985565Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback