FL H0781 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Nature Coast Oyster Alliance within FWCC; requires alliance to meet certain number of times per year; provides that purpose of the alliance is to coordinate development of comprehensive oyster resource recovery & management plan; requires alliance to establish Oyster Resource Recovery & Management Working Group; assigns certain responsibilities to working group.
Title
Oyster Fishery and Resource Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0814 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/781 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0781/BillText/Filed/PDF |