FL H0775 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOC to provide each inmate in correctional facility the opportunity to place security freeze on consumer report; requires DOC, at request of inmate, to provide appropriate forms to initiate security freeze process; requires that inmate pay all fees & expenses incurred in application for security freeze.
Title
Consumer Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00071 | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-01-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0426 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce