FL H0771 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires counties & municipalities to address contamination of recyclable material in specified contracts; prohibits counties & municipalities from requiring collection or transport of contaminated recyclable material by residential recycling collectors; specifies required contract provisions; prohibits local governments from requiring certain project verification from DEP; revises types of dock & pier replacements & repairs that are exempt from verification & certain permitting requirements; prohibits local government entities from adopting or enforcing ordinances & regulations relating to single-use plastic straws; provides for lift of moratorium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#249 (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Vetoed by Governor
2019-05-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-30HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-30SenateCS passed; YEAS 24 NAYS 15
2019-04-30SenateAmendment(s) failed (406586)
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29SenateAmendment(s) failed (633638)
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 816
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 87 NAYS 23
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (277471, 314341) 877
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-18HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-18HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-18HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 6
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/18/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-03-14HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-12HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-08HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S816 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table
H603 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4037034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403813Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/Amendment/131349/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/Amendment/314341/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/Amendment/277471/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/Amendment/663069/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/Vote/HouseVote_h00771c2249.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/771/Vote/SenateVote_h00771e1012.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback