FL H0769 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates summer youth service learning program; provides SBE, DOE, employer, student, & program requirements; provides for funding & rulemaking.
Title
Summer Youth Service Learning Program
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/769 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/769/BillText/Filed/PDF |