FL H0765 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-87
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Revises veterinary licensure exemption pertaining to certain persons practicing temporarily in state; provides circumstances that render inapplicable veterinary licensure exemption pertaining to part-time & independent contractors; prohibits specified acts relating to horsemeat for human consumption; provides penalties; increases classification of offenses related to horsemeat for human consumption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Protection [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0041 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0845 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-14 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-87
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -SJ 00736; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00736
2010-04-21 In Messages; Received -SJ 00718; Referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00718; Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00699; Substituted for CS/SB 1708 -SJ 00699; Read 2nd time -SJ 00699
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -HJ 00803; CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00803
2010-04-20 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00782; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00782
2010-03-11 Favorable by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00269; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00269
2010-03-09 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 03/11/10, 11:15 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-08 Original reference(s) removed: Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to General Government Policy Council -HJ 00225; Now in General Government Policy Council
2010-03-04 CS read 1st time on 03/04/10 -HJ 00216; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-03 CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00218
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00070; On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall
2010-03-01 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall
2010-02-05 Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council
2010-01-20 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1708 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00699; Amendment(s) adopted (652748, 446552, 161094) -SJ 00699; Substituted CS/HB 765 -SJ 00699; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 765 (Ch. 2010-87) -SJ 00699

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0474203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0500451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0828073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0828125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
082828New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0765&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb076500.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb076501c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb076502e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB07650421100845.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB07650422100041.html

Bill Comments

feedback