FL H0763 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "point-of-sale terminal"; authorizes Department of Lottery to create program that authorizes certain persons to purchase ticket or play slip for lottery game or other games at POS terminal; authorizes department to adopt rules; authorizes department, retailer operating from one or more locations, or vendor approved by department to use POS terminal to sell ticket or play slip for lottery game or other games; requires POS terminal to perform certain functions; prohibits POS terminal from revealing winning numbers; requires Florida lottery, through drawing, to select winning numbers at subsequent time & in different location; prohibits POS terminal from including video depictions of slot machine or casino game themes or titles for game play; prohibits POS terminal from being used to redeem winning ticket.
Title
Point-of-Sale Terminals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0120 (Similar To) 2015-04-14 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S1032 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy
S1032 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/763 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0763/BillText/Filed/PDF |